Global Patent Index - EP 1103089 A1

EP 1103089 A1 2001-05-30 - PIN AND SOCKET ELECTRICAL CONNECTION DEVICE

Title (en)

PIN AND SOCKET ELECTRICAL CONNECTION DEVICE

Title (de)

HERMAPHRODITISCHER ELEKTRISCHER VERBINDER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF HERMAPHRODITE DE CONNEXION ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1103089 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99936686 A

Priority

  • FR 9901930 W
  • FR 9810125 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2782197A1] The invention concerns an electrical connection device in particular for constituting geophysical data acquisition and processing systems, consisting of two identical electrically and mechanically fitting male/female connectors, each connector comprising a body (10) bearing a set of connection pins and a ring (20) enclosing the connector body base and capable of being moved in rotation relatively to said body, the connector ring comprising an raised motif (27) for plugging in the associated connector. The invention is characterised in that the body of each connector comprises two stages of raised motif of which one front raised stage substantially matching the ring motif to co-operate with the associated connector ring motif in a locked position of the device and a rear stage to co-operate with the ring motif of the same connector in a retracted position of said ring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 24/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/84 (2011.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 13/623 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/84 (2013.01); H01R 13/521 (2013.01); H01R 13/623 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0008724A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2782197 A1 20000211; FR 2782197 B1 20001103; CA 2339884 A1 20000217; CA 2339884 C 20081104; EP 1103089 A1 20010530; EP 1103089 B1 20021030; US 6447319 B1 20020910; WO 0008724 A1 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160804

2017-06-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2017-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170428

2017-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160804

2017-04-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160901

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150821

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150813

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150715

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SERCEL

- Effective date: 20040831

2007-05-16 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-08-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060804

2005-07-19 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050719

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SERCEL

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-04 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040804

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-09-10 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030910

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-11 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030811

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021119

2002-11-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE FR GB IE LU NL

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010226

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE