Global Patent Index - EP 1103196 A1

EP 1103196 A1 2001-05-30 - Rental sport shoe accessory

Title (en)

Rental sport shoe accessory

Title (de)

Zusatz für Sportschuhe zum Ausleihen

Title (fr)

Accessoire pour chaussure de sport de location

Publication

EP 1103196 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00811036 A

Priority

CH 213499 A

Abstract (en)

The disposable inner sock for a ski boot has an envelope (1) with a flexible shank (2). The sock can be inserted into a liner of the ski boot. The envelope can be of low temperature thermo-formable material. The shank can be of synthetic foam with an inner synthetic weave lining. The lining can be elastic and the shank can be split for part of its length.

Abstract (fr)

Accessoire pour chaussure de sport de location constitué d'une première de propreté (1) munie d'une tige souple (2). L'accessoire est destiné à un usage individuel et il est, de préférence, livré en sachet individuel fermé. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04; A43B 3/10; A43B 7/28; A43B 17/10; A43B 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 3/10 (2006.01); A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 7/28 (2006.01); A43B 17/10 (2006.01); A43C 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 3/106 (2013.01); A43B 3/107 (2013.01); A43B 5/0415 (2013.01); A43B 7/28 (2013.01); A43B 17/105 (2013.01); A43C 11/1493 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103196 A1 20010530; EP 1103196 B1 20050629; CH 693583 A5 20031031; DE 60021044 D1 20050804; DE 60021044 T2 20060504

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180731

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-09-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60021044

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081106

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060330

2005-08-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60021044 P 20050804

2005-06-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021004

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI