Global Patent Index - EP 1103208 A1

EP 1103208 A1 2001-05-30 - Recliner chair

Title (en)

Recliner chair

Title (de)

Liegesessel oder -sofa

Title (fr)

Chaise basculante

Publication

EP 1103208 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123329 A

Priority

EP 99123329 A

Abstract (en)

The lounger or sofa has its seat (1) connected by a pivot to a backrest (2). Guide strips (7) attached to the underside of the seat move in guides (8) attached to frame components (3). The backrest pivots are also attached to these components, which are also connected to the foot (4) of the lounger. The component and foot are linked by two pivoting coupling strips (5, 6). The front strip (5) is also attached by a pivot to the seat.

Abstract (de)

Ein Liegesessel oder ein -sofa, mit einem Sitzteil (1) und einer gelenkig daran angeschlossenen Rückenlehne (2), die von einer Sitz- in eine Liegestellung verschwenkbar sind, wobei das Sitzteil (1) unterseitig mit Führungsleisten (7) versehen ist, die jeweils in einem an einem Rahmenteil (3) befestigten Führungsglied (8) verschiebbar gelagert sind und das Rahmenteil (3), an dem die Rückenlehne (2) angelenkt ist, mit einem Standfuß (4) verbunden ist, ist so ausgebildet, dass das Rahmenteil (3) und der Standfuß (4) an jeder Seite durch zwei Koppelglieder (5, 6) gelenkig miteinander verbunden sind, von denen eines drehbar am Sitzteil (1) befestigt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/034; A47C 1/032

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/08 (2006.01); A47C 1/032 (2006.01); A47C 1/034 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/0347 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103208 A1 20010530; EP 1103208 B1 20040331; DE 59909047 D1 20040506; JP 2001169847 A 20010626

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-01-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060102

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2005-03-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-09-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909047 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020822

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000701

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI