Global Patent Index - EP 1103214 A2

EP 1103214 A2 2001-05-30 - A portable toilet seat

Title (en)

A portable toilet seat

Title (de)

Tragbarer Toilettensitz

Title (fr)

Siège de toilette portable

Publication

EP 1103214 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830755 A

Priority

IT AN990039 U

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a portable toilet seat characterised by the presence of four rectilinear notches on its entire section, two on the longitudinal axis and two on the transversal axis, it being provided that the rear notch and the two lateral notches are associated to hinges, so that the contiguous seat sections can rotate until they are placed one on top of the other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 13/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103214 A2 20010530; EP 1103214 A3 20030319; IT 248951 Y1 20030306; IT AN990039 U1 20010529; IT AN990039 V0 19991129

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030920

2004-01-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-12-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI