Global Patent Index - EP 1103286 A1

EP 1103286 A1 2001-05-30 - Device for fire fighting in tunnels

Title (en)

Device for fire fighting in tunnels

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Brandbekämpfung in Tunnels

Title (fr)

Dispositif de lutte contre l'incendie dans des tunnels

Publication

EP 1103286 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123398 A

Priority

EP 99123398 A

Abstract (en)

Openings or sector fans (6) are provided at set distance in the tunnel (1) and connected to a gas tube (4) storing an inert gas. The gas is introduced into the tunnel via nozzles (7) in the tunnel sector. When the smoke is detected a sector fan (6) nearest to the smoke location is opened automatically or in remote controlled manner. The fans (6) are installed on the roof or sidewalls of the tunnel and the gas tube (4) in the same or separate, parallel tunnel. The inert gas is nitrogen or argon. The fans are automatically operated via a linear fire alarm system (3,6).

Abstract (de)

Die Einrichtung umfasst ein als Speicher für ein Inertgas wirkendes Gasrohr (4) und mit diesem verbundene und als Sektorventile (6) bezeichnete Öffnungsarmaturen für die Freisetzung des Inertgases über Düsen (7) in einen Tunnelsektor. Das Gasrohr (4) ist im Tunnel (1) selbst oder in einem Paralleltunnel verlegt. Bei Detektion eines Brandes erfolgt eine automatische oder ferngesteuerte Öffnung mindestens des dem Brandort am nächsten liegenden Sektorventils (6). Der Tunnel (1) ist mit einer Brandmeldeanlage ausgerüstet, welche durch ein lineares Wärmemeldesystem (3, 6) gebildet ist; die Sektorventile (6) sind durch das Wärmemeldesystem (3, 6) automatisch betätigbar. Das Inertgas ist vorzugsweise durch Stickstoff oder Argon gebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 39/00; A62C 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 3/02 (2006.01); A62C 35/64 (2006.01); A62C 37/36 (2006.01); A62C 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 99/0018 (2013.01); A62C 3/0221 (2013.01); A62C 3/0292 (2013.01); A62C 35/645 (2013.01); A62C 37/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9913949 A1 19990325 - SUNDHOLM GOERAN [FI]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 14 31 December 1998 (1998-12-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 13 30 November 1998 (1998-11-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103286 A1 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-12 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A62C0039000000

- IPC: A62C0003000000

- Effective date: 20150107

2015-01-07 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A62C0039000000

- IPC: A62C0003000000

2014-12-31 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140708

2014-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2014-03-26 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140224

2014-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A62C 3/02 20060101AFI20140121BHEP

2014-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A62C 37/36 20060101ALI20140121BHEP

2014-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A62C 35/64 20060101ALI20140121BHEP

2013-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2008-02-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2005-11-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011120

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI