Global Patent Index - EP 1103290 A1

EP 1103290 A1 2001-05-30 - Snowboard binding

Title (en)

Snowboard binding

Title (de)

Snowboardbindung

Title (fr)

Fixation de surf

Publication

EP 1103290 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420237 A

Priority

FR 9914821 A

Abstract (en)

The binding for a snowboard has a base (2) mounted on the board and a rear arcuate binding (3) mounted on the base via two hooking points. A channel section (5) is pivotally mounted with respect to the rear binding. Toothed surfaces allow adjustment of the vertical position of each anchor point of the rear binding on the base.

Abstract (fr)

Fixation (1) de surf, du type comportant : une embase (2) destinée à être montée sur une planche de surf ; un arceau arrière (3), monté sur l'embase (2) au niveau de deux points d'accrochage ; une gouttière (5) montée pivotante par rapport à l'arceau arrière (3), caractérisée en ce qu'elle comporte des moyens pour modifier indépendamment la position verticale de chaque point d'accrochage de l'arceau (3) sur l'embase (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/22 (2012.01); A63C 10/24 (2012.01); A63C 10/04 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/24 (2013.01); A63C 10/22 (2013.01); A63C 10/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 9113766 U1 19920227

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103290 A1 20010530; EP 1103290 B1 20050831; AT 303183 T 20050915; DE 60022295 D1 20051006; DE 60022295 T2 20060608; FR 2801514 A1 20010601; FR 2801514 B1 20011221; US 6581944 B1 20030624

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141128

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60022295

- Effective date: 20120601

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101112

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081116

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071116

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061116

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-10-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051018

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-10-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60022295 P 20051006

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR IT

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011005

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI