Global Patent Index - EP 1103311 A1

EP 1103311 A1 2001-05-30 - Pop-up sprinkler device with drainage valve

Title (en)

Pop-up sprinkler device with drainage valve

Title (de)

Versenkregner mit Entwässerungsventil

Title (fr)

Arroseur escamotable avec soupape de drainage

Publication

EP 1103311 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00204024 A

Priority

IT MI992468 A

Abstract (en)

A pop-up sprinkler device (3) is described comprising an external housing (4) and an internal mobile part (5) that is provided with a delivery head (9), that partially comes out of the external housing (4) when it is supplied with water in pressure that is coming from a supply pipe below (1). The lower end of said internal mobile part (5) is provided with a valve (14) that closes the water inlet once the pressure of supply of the same water stops. The valve (14) has small slots (16) that are suitable to allow, in the absence of pressure, the drainage of the water toward said pipe below (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/70 (2018.01); B05B 15/74 (2018.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/70 (2018.02); B05B 15/74 (2018.02)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103311 A1 20010530; EP 1103311 B1 20030409; DE 60002025 D1 20030515; ES 2194673 T3 20031201; IT 1313849 B1 20020924; IT MI992468 A1 20010525; IT MI992468 D0 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171204

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-01-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-10 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011120

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI