Global Patent Index - EP 1103315 A2

EP 1103315 A2 2001-05-30 - Extrusion press

Title (en)

Extrusion press

Title (de)

Strangpresse bzw. Rohr- und Strangpresse

Title (fr)

Presse d'extrusion

Publication

EP 1103315 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121069 A

Priority

DE 19951933 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19951933A1] The press has a shear blade which can be raised and lowered to cut off the press butt. The shear blade (e.g. 13a) is mounted on the shear push rod (12) so that it can be turned by a setting force (F) acting in the direction towards the tool. There may be a dish spring pack (18) to apply the setting force to the shear blade.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Strangpresse (1) bzw. Rohr- und Strangpresse mit einer ein heb- und senkbares Schermesser (13a,13b) zum Abtrennen eines sich am zu strangpressenden Einsatzmaterial ausbildenden, aus dem Werkzeug (3) vorragenden Preßrestes (11) aufweisenden Schere (10), wird ein stets einwandfreier Trennschnitt gewährleistet, wenn das Schermesser (13a,13b) gegen eine in Richtung auf das Werkzeug (3) wirkende Anstellkraft verschwenkbar am Scherenstößel (12) gelagert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 23/21; B21C 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23D 23/00 (2006.01); B21C 35/04 (2006.01); B21J 5/06 (2006.01); B23D 15/04 (2006.01); B23D 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 35/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19951933 A1 20010503; AT 281252 T 20041115; EP 1103315 A2 20010530; EP 1103315 A3 20020206; EP 1103315 B1 20041103; ES 2231096 T3 20050516; JP 2001179528 A 20010703; US 6389863 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100929

2011-10-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111020

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008492

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100928

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090924

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060928

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060928

2006-09-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060928

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-09-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050919

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-09-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050919

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050823

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2231096 T3

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008492 P 20041209

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2004-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI