Global Patent Index - EP 1103317 A2

EP 1103317 A2 2001-05-30 - Method and apparatus for punching aluminium sheet metal parts

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for punching aluminium sheet metal parts

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Lochen von Blechformteilen aus einem Aluminiumwerkstoff

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de poinçonnage des pièces en tôle d' aluminium

Publication

EP 1103317 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00125744 A

Priority

DE 19957076 A

Abstract (en)

The hole forming process involves producing a thickening (7) along the hole circumference by a preliminary deformation. The aluminum sheet component (3) is deformed between a holding-down device (1) and a die (2) When the component is deformed by a punch (5), material is forces out of the hole region into the die.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren bzw. eine Vorrichtung zum Lochen von Blechformteilen (3) aus einem Aluminiumwerkstoff, bei welchem in den Flanschbereichen Löcher hergestellt werden. Die erfindungsgemäße Ausgestaltung dieses Verfahrens ermöglicht eine deutliche Verbesserung der mechanischen Belastbarkeit der im Flanschbereich vorgesehenen Löcher dadurch, daß entlang des Lochumfanges eine Aufdickung (7) durch eine Vorverformung hergestellt wird, das Blechformteil beim Vorverformen zwischen einem Niederhalter (1,9) und einer Matrize (2,10) gehalten wird und bei der Vorverformung durch einen Stempel (5,11) das Material aus dem Lochbereich (6) in die Matrize verdrängt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 28/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103317 A2 20010530; EP 1103317 A3 20020206; EP 1103317 B1 20060118; DE 19957076 A1 20010607; DE 19957076 B4 20061019; DE 50012075 D1 20060406; ES 2257256 T3 20060801; PT 1103317 E 20060531

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081124

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061125

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061125

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061124

2007-09-12 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070827

2007-08-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070827

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061124

2007-07-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-11-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061125

2006-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2257256 T3

2006-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20060330

2006-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060405

2006-04-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012075 P 20060406

2006-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2006-01-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060118

2005-11-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020322

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI