Global Patent Index - EP 1103320 A1

EP 1103320 A1 2001-05-30 - Hemming device

Title (en)

Hemming device

Title (de)

Bördelvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Machine à border

Publication

EP 1103320 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123455 A

Priority

  • EP 99123455 A
  • US 6387202 A

Abstract (en)

The flanging device produces flanges on vehicle bodywork sheets. It has a base frame (1) with a rise-and-fall flanging bed (20) and flanging jaws (17, 18). The flanging tool (2) includes components specific to the workpiece, primarily the flanging bed and flanging jaws, and is fitted to the base frame as a changeable unit.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Bördelvorrichtung für Bleche, insbesondere für Karosseriebleche im Fahrzeugbau, mit einem Grundgestell (1), mit einem heb- und senkbaren Bördelbett (20) und mit in den Arbeitsbereich des Bördelbettes beweglichen Bördelbacken (17,18). Das Bördelwerkzeug (2) weist die wesentlichen werkstückspezifischen Komponenten, vor allem das Bördelbett (20) und die Bördelbacken (17,18) auf und ist als wechselbare Einheit im Grundgestell angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/02; B21D 37/10; B21D 37/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 37/10 (2006.01); B21D 37/14 (2006.01); B21D 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 37/14 (2013.01); B21D 37/10 (2013.01); B21D 39/021 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53791 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103320 A1 20010530; EP 1103320 B1 20030423; DE 59905215 D1 20030528; ES 2198840 T3 20040201; US 2003217580 A1 20031127; US 6644088 B1 20031111

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171207

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171130

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161125

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-08-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170731

2017-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161125

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2198840 T3

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905215 P 20030528

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020121

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI