Global Patent Index - EP 1103321 A1

EP 1103321 A1 2001-05-30 - Strand guiding means in a vertical-curved continuous casting plant

Title (en)

Strand guiding means in a vertical-curved continuous casting plant

Title (de)

Strangführung einer Vertikalabbiege-Stranggiessanlage

Title (fr)

Système de guidage de barres de coulée pour installation de coulée continue verticale-courbe

Publication

EP 1103321 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00123616 A

Priority

DE 19956556 A

Abstract (en)

Radius configuration of a rod guide comprises a bending zone with a first region (5) of intensive bending and a second region (6) of softer bending. The rod guide is bent in the first region extending from an infinite radius of the vertical path (3) with a bend from a progression of a smaller radius (R1i) and in the second region with a less intensive bend (R2i) than the first region. The transition zone (7) which forms the transition between the bending zones and the main radius guide zone (8) has a constant bend with increasing length of the radii ( delta R) formed.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Radien-Konfiguration der Strangführung einer durch Umbau aus einer Kreisbogen-Anlage hervorgegangenen Vertikalabbiege-Stranggießanlage mit einer geraden Kokille (1) und einer der Vertikalabbiegestrecke (2) vorgeordneten vertikalen Strecke (3) sowie nachgeordneten horizontalen Strecke (4), umfassend: eine Biegezone (5, 6); eine Übergangs-Richtzone (7); eine Hauptradius-Führungszone (8); sowie eine Übergangs-Endrichtzone (9). Die Biegezone (5, 6) ist mit einem ersten Bereich (5) vergleichsweise intensiveren Abbiegens und mit einem anschließenden zweiten Bereich (6) vergleichsweise sanfteren Abbiegens ausgebildet. Die Strangführung ist im ersten Bereich (5), ausgehend vom unendlichen Radius der vertikalen Strecke (3), mit einer Krümmung aus einer Folge stetig kleiner werdenden Radien (R1i) und im zweiten, daran anschließenden Bereich (6) mit einer vergleichsweise weniger intensiven Krümmung (R2i) gebogen. Die Übergangs-Richtzone (7), welche den Übergang zwischen der Biegezone (5, 6) und der Hauptradius-Führungszone (8) bildet, weist eine stetige Krümmung mit steigender Länge der sie bildenden Radien (ΔR) auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/128

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/041 (2006.01); B22D 11/128 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/1282 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103321 A1 20010530; EP 1103321 B1 20050330; AT 291979 T 20050415; DE 19956556 A1 20010531; JP 2001179410 A 20010703; JP 5161406 B2 20130313; US 6607021 B1 20030819

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-10-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50009906

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131028

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131028

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131028

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131028

2014-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 291979 T

- Effective date: 20131028

2014-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50009906

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121011

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121026

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121019

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050330

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2006-05-26 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-03-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060102

2005-10-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-08-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-07-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050711

2005-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009906 P 20050504

2005-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

2005-03-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050330

2004-11-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: STRAND GUIDING MEANS IN A VERTICAL-CURVED CONTINUOUS CASTING PLANT

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040218

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001116

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI