Global Patent Index - EP 1103323 A2

EP 1103323 A2 2001-05-30 - Process and device for continuous casting of steel

Title (en)

Process and device for continuous casting of steel

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Stranggiessen von Stahl

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la coulée continue d'acier

Publication

EP 1103323 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00125313 A

Priority

DE 19957414 A

Abstract (en)

Process for continuously casting steel comprises controlling the mold cooling water inlet temperature, and reducing the temperature with increasing casting speed. An Independent claim is also included for a device for continuously casting steel, comprising a copper mold with copper mold plates (7) having a thickness of 40-5 mm to control the cooling water pressure (12) between 5 and 30 bar and the cooling water speed between 5-15 m/sec.. The cooling water inlet temperature is 10-45 degrees C. Preferred Features: The mold is oscillated.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Stranggießen von Stahl mittels einer gekühlten, Platten (7) bestimmter dicke aufweisenden Kokille wird die Kokillenkühlwassereinlauftemperatur geregelt und mit steigender Gießgeschwindigkeit abgesenkt. Die Kokillenplatten (7) bestehen aus Kupfer mit einer Dicke von 40 bis 5 mm, der Kokillenwasserdruck (22) ist zwischen 5 und 30 bar und die Kokillenwassergeschwindigkeit (18) zwischen 5 bis 15 m/sec regelbar und die Kokillenkühlwassereinlauftemperatur ist zwischen 10° und 45°C wählbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103323 A2 20010530; EP 1103323 A3 20010919

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050910

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041019

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI