Global Patent Index - EP 1103325 A1

EP 1103325 A1 2001-05-30 - Process and device for cleaning cast copper anodes from encrustations of lime and barite

Title (en)

Process and device for cleaning cast copper anodes from encrustations of lime and barite

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Abreinigen gegossener Kupferanoden von anhaftenden Resten einer Kalk- und Schwerspatverkrustung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour enlever les restants d'encrassement de chaux et de barite des anodes en cuivre coulées

Publication

EP 1103325 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00123622 A

Priority

  • DE 19956758 A
  • DE 10015376 A

Abstract (en)

Process for cleaning cast copper anodes (10) comprises inserting the anodes into a cleaning station when passing through the water-cooled sink (2), staggering in relative movement to a cleaning device, completely removing the residues and further transporting to a lifting device (3) at the outlet-side end (4) of the water-cooled sink. An Independent claim is also included for an apparatus for cleaning cast copper anodes. Preferred Features: Two wire brushes (20) are used as the cleaning device, which are horizontally directed and driven by a separate electro- and/or hydraulic motor (21).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Abreinigen gegossener Kupferanoden (10) von anhaftenden Resten einer Schlichteverkrustung, wobei die aus der Gießhitze noch ca. 700 bis 900 °C heißen Platten in ein längliches Wasserkühlbecken (2) eingesetzt und darin bei taktweisem Transport zu einem Aushebebereich (1) gefördert und, an diesem angekommen, mit einer Aushebeeinrichtung (3) an eine anschließende Bündelungsvorrichtung zur weiteren Verwendung übergeben werden. Dieses Verfahren wird in der Weise weiterentwickelt, daß die Anoden (10) beim Durchlauf durch das Wasserkühlbecken (2) in eine Reinigungsstation (11) eingebracht, darin im Stillstand wenigstens eines Transporttaktes in Relativbewegungen zu wenigstens einem Reinigungsmittel (13, 13') versetzt, dabei Reste der Schlichtekruste vollständig abgereinigt, und anschließend bei wieder einsetzendem taktweisen Transport zur Aushebeeinrichtung (3) am austragseitigen Ende (4) des Wasserkühlbeckens (2) weitertransportiert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 31/00; B22D 25/04; B22D 30/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 25/04 (2006.01); B22D 30/00 (2006.01); B22D 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 25/04 (2013.01); B22D 30/00 (2013.01); B22D 31/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4807689 A 19890228 - BENEITONE RAYMOND D [US]
  • [A] US 3976120 A 19760824 - RAAB STEFAN
  • [A] DE 2309358 A1 19740829 - NORDDEUTSCHE AFFINERIE
  • [A] US 5064051 A 19911112 - BLUNDY ROBERT F [US]
  • [A] US 5600861 A 19970211 - SAITO SHOJI [JP]
  • [A] "KOMPAKTGERAET FUER DAS TROCKENEIS-STRAHLEN", GIESSEREI,DE,GIESSEREI VERLAG. DUSSELDORF, vol. 86, no. 2, 15 February 1999 (1999-02-15), pages 102,104, XP000803247, ISSN: 0016-9765
  • [A] AUST E ET AL: "DER ABRASIV HOCHDRUCK-WASSERSTRAHL ALS WERKZEUG ZUM GUSSPUTZEN", GIESSEREI,DE,GIESSEREI VERLAG. DUSSELDORF, vol. 83, no. 20, 14 October 1996 (1996-10-14), pages 21 - 27, XP000679950, ISSN: 0016-9765

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103325 A1 20010530; EP 1103325 B1 20040825; AT 274390 T 20040915; ES 2224991 T3 20050316

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121029

2014-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140527

2013-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121028

2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50007552

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121028

2013-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121029

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 274390 T

- Effective date: 20121028

2013-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-06-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120329

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-06-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-08-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2224991 T3

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007552 P 20040930

2004-08-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI SE

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FI SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001116

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI