Global Patent Index - EP 1103350 A2

EP 1103350 A2 2001-05-30 - Machine tool with electromagnet for mounting on a ferromagnetic workpiece

Title (en)

Machine tool with electromagnet for mounting on a ferromagnetic workpiece

Title (de)

Werkzeugmaschine mit einem Elektromagneten zur Befestigung an einem ferromagnetischen Werkstück

Title (fr)

Machine-outil avec électro-aimant pour la fixation à une pièce ferromagnétique

Publication

EP 1103350 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121732 A

Priority

DE 19956155 A

Abstract (en)

The machine tool has an electromagnet (30) used for securing a ferromagnetic workpiece and a switching device (S) with at least 2 different switch states, for controlling the electromagnet and a drive device (42) for the machine tool. The electromagnet current is reduced for securing the workpiece when the drive is not operated relative to the currrent used for securing the workpiece when the drive is operated.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Werkzeugmaschine (40) mit einem Elektromagneten (62) zur Befestigung an einem ferromagnetischen Werkstück (41) angegeben, mit einer Schalteinrichtung (S) mit mindestens zwei Schaltzuständen, einem Arbeitszustand, in dem der Elektromagnet (62) und eine Antriebseinrichtung (56, 58, 60) der Werkzeugmaschine (40) aktiviert sind, und einem Haltezustand, in dem der Elektromagnet (62), nicht jedoch die Antriebseinrichtung (56, 58, 60) aktiviert ist, wobei Mittel (52, 86) vorgesehen sind, durch die der Strom des Elektromagneten (62) im Haltezustand gegenüber dem Strom des Elektromagneten (62) im Arbeitszustand reduziert ist (Fig. 2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 45/14 (2006.01); B25H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25H 1/0071 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 3371257 A 19680227 - WARREN WESLEY S, et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103350 A2 20010530; EP 1103350 A3 20011219; EP 1103350 B1 20090128; DE 19956155 A1 20010531; DE 19956155 B4 20111201; DE 50015540 D1 20090319

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161102

2017-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-07-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50015540

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151012

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150908

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-09-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131005

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131005

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131005

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121003

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121012

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091029

2009-03-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015540 P 20090319

2009-01-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-01-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2009-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2009-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-08-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070716

2006-06-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: C. & E. FEIN GMBH

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: C. & E. FEIN GMBH

2004-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: C. & E. FEIN GMBH

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020612

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI