Global Patent Index - EP 1103356 A2

EP 1103356 A2 2001-05-30 - Apparatus and method for processing printed material at high speed

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for processing printed material at high speed

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Bearbeiten von Druckprodukten mit hoher Geschwindigkeit

Title (fr)

Dispositif ainsi que procédé pour le traitement à grande vitesse de produits imprimés

Publication

EP 1103356 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00123430 A

Priority

US 44912799 A

Abstract (en)

The printed product processing device has at least one divider (100), for separation of a printed product stream (1) into at least 2 partial streams (101,102), which are moved in similar directions, e.g. parallel to one another, with respective processing stations (151,251), e.g. separation stations for each of the partial streams, before combining to provide a common output product stream (6). An Independent claim for a printed product processing method is also included.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zum Bearbeiten von Druckprodukten umfasst eine Trennvorrichtung (100) zum Teilen eines Produktstroms (1) in mindestens zwei Teilströme (101, 102), die im Wesentlichen in die gleiche Richtung bewegt werden, eine erste Bearbeitungsstation (151) zum Bearbeiten der Produkte (3) des ersten Produktstroms (101) der mindestens zwei Produktströme, eine zweite Bearbeitungsstation (251) zum Bearbeiten der Produkte (3) des zweiten Produktstroms (102) der mindestens zwei Produktströme (101, 102) und eine Zusammenführ-Einrichtung (150) zum Zusammenführen der mindestens zwei Teilströme (101, 102) zu einem auslaufenden Produktstrom (6). Ein Verfahren zum Bearbeiten eines Produktstroms (1) sieht vor, dass der Produktstrom (1) in eine Vielzahl von Teilströmen (101, 102) geteilt wird, die in ähnliche Richtungen bewegt werden, das die Produkte (3) in den Teilströmen (101, 102) bearbeitet werden und dass die Teilströme (101, 102) zu einem Produktstrom (6) zusammengeführt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/06; B26D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/06 (2006.01); B26D 11/00 (2006.01); B42C 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/0675 (2013.01); B26D 11/00 (2013.01); B42C 19/08 (2013.01); B65H 2301/3421 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4454 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4455 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103356 A2 20010530; EP 1103356 A3 20031119; DE 10054453 A1 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-09-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 26D 7/06 A

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 26D 11/00 B

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI