Global Patent Index - EP 1103357 A2

EP 1103357 A2 2001-05-30 - Apparatus and method for cutting printed material

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for cutting printed material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Zuschneiden von Druckprodukten

Title (fr)

Dispositif ainsi que méthode pour la coupe de produits imprimés

Publication

EP 1103357 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122296 A

Priority

US 44898699 A

Abstract (en)

The printed product web separation device has at least 2 different separation units (151,251) for separation of different printed product streams (101,102) which are moved in similar directions, e.g. parallel to one another. The separation devices may operate from different sides of the respective product streams. An Independent claim for a printed product separation method is also included.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung (50) zum Zuschneiden der Produkte mehrerer Ströme (101, 102) von Druckprodukten (3) umfasst eine erste Schneideeinheit (151) zum Zuschneiden von mindestens einer Seite der Produkte (3) des ersten Produktstroms (101) und eine zweite Schneideeinheit (251) zum Zuschneiden von mindestens einer Seite der Produkte (3) eines zweiten Produktstroms (102), wobei sich der erste und zweite Produktstrom (101, 102) in ähnliche Richtungen bewegen. Ein Verfahren zum Zuschneiden der Produkte mehrerer Ströme (101, 102, 103, 104) von Druckprodukten (3) sieht vor, dass ein erster Produktstrom (101) in eine erste Richtung bewegt wird, die Produkte (3) des ersten Stroms (101) an mindestens einer Seite beschnitten werden, ein zweiter Produktstrom (102) in eine ähnliche Richtung wie der erste Produktstrom (101) bewegt wird und die Produkte des zweiten Produktstroms (102) an mindestens einer Seite beschnitten werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 11/00; B26D 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/56 (2006.01); B26D 1/08 (2006.01); B26D 7/06 (2006.01); B26D 11/00 (2006.01); B42C 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/0675 (2013.01); B26D 11/00 (2013.01); B42C 19/08 (2013.01); B65H 2301/23 (2013.01); B65H 2301/3421 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4454 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4455 (2013.01); Y10T 83/0448 (2015.04); Y10T 83/447 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4493 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4506 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4511 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4577 (2015.04); Y10T 83/462 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4632 (2015.04); Y10T 83/464 (2015.04); Y10T 83/6478 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103357 A2 20010530; EP 1103357 A3 20031119; DE 10052010 A1 20010531; JP 2001212792 A 20010807; US 2002035907 A1 20020328; US 6516695 B2 20030211

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-09-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI