Global Patent Index - EP 1103369 A2

EP 1103369 A2 2001-05-30 - Method and device for making collars for hinged-lid boxes

Title (en)

Method and device for making collars for hinged-lid boxes

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Kragen für Klappschachteln

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de collerettes pour des boîtes avec un couvercle à charnière

Publication

EP 1103369 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00123945 A

Priority

DE 19957058 A

Abstract (en)

The collar making process involves producing a collar (13) which has a group of grooves (18) between the front wall (19) of the collar and the side flaps (20, 21), forming rounded upright collar edges (16, 17). When the grooves (15) are applied to the collar, a field (24) with no grooves is left. In this region a tab (22) is formed as an aid to closing the lid.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Kragen (13), die zwischen Kragen-Vorderwand (19) und Kragen-Seitenlappen (20, 21) jeweils eine Gruppe von Rillen (18) aufweisen zur Bildung von gerundeten aufrechten Kragenkanten (16, 17). Bei der Herstellung der Kragen (13) wird beim Anbringen der Rillen (15) ein Feld (24) ausgespart, das keine Rillen aufweist. In diesem Bereich wird durch C-förmige Stanzung (23) eine Lasche (22) gebildet, die als Schließhilfe für einen Deckel dient. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 1/74; B31B 1/20; B31B 1/25; B31B 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/20 (2006.01); B31B 1/25 (2006.01); B31B 1/74 (2006.01); B31B 3/00 (2006.01); B31B 3/28 (2006.01); B65D 85/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/1045 (2013.01); B31D 5/0004 (2013.01); B31F 1/10 (2013.01); B31B 50/146 (2017.08); B31B 50/254 (2017.08); B31B 50/256 (2017.08); B31B 50/44 (2017.08); B31B 2241/003 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103369 A2 20010530; EP 1103369 A3 20011031; EP 1103369 B1 20040811; DE 19957058 A1 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50007362

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161103

2017-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161103

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161129

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-29 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 50007362

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B31B0001740000

- IPC: B31B0050740000

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

2004-09-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007362 P 20040916

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030723

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI