Global Patent Index - EP 1103375 A2

EP 1103375 A2 2001-05-30 - Sheet-fed rotary printing machine for selectively printing on one side or perfecting

Title (en)

Sheet-fed rotary printing machine for selectively printing on one side or perfecting

Title (de)

Bogenrotationsdruckmaschine für den wahlweisen Schöndruck oder Schön- und Widerdruck

Title (fr)

Machine à imprimer rotative à feuilles pour l'impression sélective sur une face ou à retiration

Publication

EP 1103375 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121530 A

Priority

DE 19957230 A

Abstract (en)

The three-drum-turning press has its drums between the printing cylinders (2) of two printing mechanisms. Taking the transfer cylinders in sheet feed direction, the first one (5) has at least twice the diameter of the turning drum (9). The second one (8), of similar diameter, serves as a storage drum and the third transfer cylinder is the turning drum itself.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Bogenrotationsdruckmaschine für den wahlweisen Schöndruck oder Schön- und Widerdruck, in denen der Bogen im Schön- und Widerdruck nach dem Prinzip der Bogenhinterkantenwendung gewendet wird. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, eine Bogenrotationsdruckmaschine für den wahlweisen Schöndruck oder Schön- und Widerdruck zu schaffen, die kostengünstig hergestellt werden kann und in der Betriebsart Schön- und Widerdruck einen schlanken Bogenlauf gewährleistet. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Aufgabe dadurch gelöst, wobei die Drei-Trommel-Wendung zwischen den Druckzylindern (2) zweier Druckwerke (1) vorgesehen ist, und in Bogenförderrichtung gesehen die Übergabezylinder (5,8,9) aus einem ersten Übergabezylinder (5) mit gegenüber der Wendetrommel (9) doppelt- oder mehrfach-großem Durchmesser, einem als Speichertrommel (8) ausgebildeten zweiten Übergabezylinder (8) mit gegenüber der Wendetrommel (9) doppelt- oder mehrfach-großem Durchmesser und einem als Wendetrommel (9) ausgebildeten dritten Übergabezylinder (9) mit einfach-großem Durchmesser bestehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/106 (2013.01); B41F 21/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103375 A2 20010530; EP 1103375 A3 20020410; EP 1103375 B1 20050302; DE 19957230 A1 20010531; DE 19957230 B4 20050818; ES 2235732 T3 20050716

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171011

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170831

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170929

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 97080 WUERZBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50009628

2011-04-21 [REG DE R100] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50009628

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-03-09 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20110201

2008-10-29 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MANROLAND AG

- Effective date: 20051125

2008-10-29 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20051130

2006-01-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20051125

2006-01-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20051130

2006-01-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20051125

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2235732 T3

2005-07-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050614

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009628 P 20050407

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2002-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020302

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI