Global Patent Index - EP 1103460 A2

EP 1103460 A2 2001-05-30 - Tensioning device of the belt for the fastening of the compressed gas bottles to the back of a jacket or the like for underwater activity

Title (en)

Tensioning device of the belt for the fastening of the compressed gas bottles to the back of a jacket or the like for underwater activity

Title (de)

Spannvorrichtung für die Befestigungsgurte der Druckluftflaschen auf dem Rücken einer Taucherweste

Title (fr)

Appareil tendeur de la ceinture de serrage des bouteilles d'air comprimé au dos du gilet ou équivalent, des plongeurs

Publication

EP 1103460 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00122000 A

Priority

IT GE990137 A

Abstract (en)

Tensioning device of the belt (1) for the fastening of the compressed gas bottles (2) to the back (3) of a jacket or the like for underwater activity, characterized in that between the two ends of the bottle (2) fastening belt (1) it is inserted a pneumatic jack (9), connected to a suitable compressed gas source, proper to provide for an optimal belt (1) tensioning power for its locking on the bottle (2) itself. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63C 11/22; A62B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 9/04 (2006.01); B63C 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 9/04 (2013.01); B63C 11/22 (2013.01); B63C 2011/229 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103460 A2 20010530; EP 1103460 A3 20011010; EP 1103460 A9 20020612; EP 1103460 B1 20030709; DE 60003770 D1 20030814; DE 60003770 T2 20040527; IT 1311966 B1 20020320; IT GE990137 A1 20010524; JP 2001171596 A 20010626

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061008

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2004-12-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041217

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-07-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-03-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003770 P 20030814

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020820

2002-07-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MINOPOLI, GIUSEPPE

2002-07-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GAROFALO, GIOVANNI

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020308

2002-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MINOPOLI, GIUSEPPE

2002-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GAROFALO, GIOVANNI

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-03 [D17D] PUBLICATION OF THE DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI