Global patent index - EP 1103465 A1

EP 1103465 A1 2001-05-30 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING HINGED-LID BOXES FOR CIGARETTES

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING HINGED-LID BOXES FOR CIGARETTES

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Klappschachteln für Zigaretten

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR FABRIQUER DES PAQUETS DE CIGARETTES A CHARNIERE

Publication

EP 1103465 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124106 A

Priority

DE 19957415 A

Abstract (en)

The cigarette box producing process produces packs (10) from thin card with an outer cover (13) of shrink wrap. The folding tabs (e.g. 23-26) of the outer cover and bonded to each other by full-surface thermal seals. The head of this process shrinks the wrap. Before full surface sealing, the folding tabs are tacked to each other by means of a tacking seal with small limited sealing surfaces.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von Packungen (10) aus dünnem Karton mit einer Außenumhüllung (13) aus einer Schrumpffolie. Faltlappen (20, 21; 23, 24, 25, 26) der Außenumhüllung (13) werden durch vollflächiges thermisches Siegeln miteinander verbunden. Dadurch kann der Schrumpfprozess für die Außenumhüllung (13) eingeleitet werden. Um eine korrekte Form der Außenumhüllung (13) zu gewährleisten, werden die Faltlappen (20, 21; 23, 24, 25, 26) vor dem vollflächigen Siegeln durch eine Heftsiegelung mit kleinen, begrenzten Siegelflächen miteinander verbunden und danach vollflächig gesiegelt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 19/20; B65B 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 53/02 (2006.01); B65B 11/42 (2006.01); B65B 19/20 (2006.01); B65B 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 53/02 (2013.01); B65B 19/20 (2013.01); B65B 19/223 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103465 A1 20010530; EP 1103465 B1 20040922; EP 1103465 B2 20070523; BR 0005626 A 20010717; BR 0005626 B1 20100406; CN 1196626 C 20050413; CN 1297834 A 20010606; DE 19957415 A1 20010531; JP 2001192001 A 20010717; JP 4588866 B2 20101201; US 7200978 B1 20070410

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151104

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-06-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20150601

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131109

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131108

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-11-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2007-09-21 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2007-08-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20070523

2007-06-29 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2007-06-13 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2007-05-23 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20070523

2007-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2005-10-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: G.D SOCIETA PER AZIONI

2005-09-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-08-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: G.D SOCIETAE PER AZIONI

- Effective date: 20050620

2005-02-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050124

2005-01-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2004-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007873

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030707

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010427

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI