Global Patent Index - EP 1103467 A1

EP 1103467 A1 2001-05-30 - Method and apparatus for packaging crystalline fat-containing products

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for packaging crystalline fat-containing products

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von Kristallinen fetthaltigen Produkten

Title (fr)

Procede et appareil pour conditionner des produits cristallins contenant des matieres grasses

Publication

EP 1103467 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00204205 A

Priority

NL 1013694 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a method for packaging a product which is plastic in the preparation, wherein this plastic product is packaged in amounts of 2-50 kg, preferably of 5-25 kg, in a foil which at least consists of a heat-sealable material and which foil is applied around the product to be packaged, so that the foil completely encloses the product, and which foil is thereafter sealed using heat, whereafter the packaged product is cooled and stored in a conventional manner. The invention also relates to a packaged product and packaging apparatus. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 25/06; B65B 9/06; B65B 9/20; B65B 31/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/213 (2012.01); B65B 25/06 (2006.01); B65B 31/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 31/045 (2013.01); B65B 9/213 (2013.01); B65B 25/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR IE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103467 A1 20010530; NL 1013694 C2 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-03-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR IE NL

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011129

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR IE NL

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI