Global Patent Index - EP 1103476 A1

EP 1103476 A1 2001-05-30 - Container lid as well as a container provided with such a lid

Title (en)

Container lid as well as a container provided with such a lid

Title (de)

Deckel für eine Dose sowie mit diesem ausgestattete Dose

Title (fr)

Couvercle de boîte ainsi qu'une boîte pourvue d'un tel couvercle

Publication

EP 1103476 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00125088 A

Priority

DE 19956673 A

Abstract (en)

The one-part cap or cover (1) of aluminum plate has an opening mandrel (2) with a curved grip section in the center, and a locking nose or projection (3) above the opening dome cap. The cap is manufactured as a single part by deep-drawing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Deckel für eine Dose, der eine Mehrzahl von rotationssymmetrisch angeordneten Domen (6) aufweist. Einer von den Domen (6) ist als Öffnungsdom (6') ausgebildet und dient als Betätigungselement für das Aufreißen einer einstückig mit dem Deckel verbundenen Öffnungslasche. Durch die ringförmige bzw. kronenförmige Anordnung der Dome (6) ist eine Stapelbarkeit der Deckel gegeben, so dass der herstellungstechnische Aufwand für Deckel solcher Art verringert werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 17/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 17/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 17/4012 (2018.01); B65D 17/34 (2018.01); B65D 21/022 (2013.01); B65D 2517/0056 (2013.01); B65D 2517/0062 (2013.01); B65D 2517/007 (2013.01); B65D 2517/0071 (2013.01); B65D 2517/0082 (2013.01); B65D 2517/5083 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5535911 A 19960716 - CORTEZ ALEJANDRO [US]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103476 A1 20010530; BR 0005964 A 20010731; MX PA00011543 A 20020424

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-03-20 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20011130;LT PAYMENT 20011130;LV PAYMENT 20011130;MK PAYMENT 20011130;RO PAYMENT 20011130;SI PAYMENT 20011130

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI