Global Patent Index - EP 1103482 A2

EP 1103482 A2 2001-05-30 - Sales package for a drill bit

Title (en)

Sales package for a drill bit

Title (de)

Verkaufsverpackung für ein Bohrwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Emballage de vente pour un trépan

Publication

EP 1103482 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124290 A

Priority

DE 29920551 U

Abstract (en)

The holder has a main body with slot (18), which has two projections. The main body consists of two sections (12,14) fastened to each other via a locking connection (20). Each section has a part of each projection, and the two parts of each projection engage on each other in a step-shape. Each section may have a locking bracket, and the projections engage into the brackets. The two sections are of plastic, timber, or metal.

Abstract (de)

Eine Haltevorrichtung für ein Werkzeug, mit einem Grundkörper (10), der einen Schlitz (18) aufweist, der mit zwei Vorsprüngen (22) versehen ist, ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß der Grundkörper aus zwei Hälften (12, 14) besteht, die aneinander befestigt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 73/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/50 (2006.01); B65D 73/00 (2006.01); B65D 85/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 73/0071 (2013.01); B65D 71/50 (2013.01); B65D 85/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29904169 U1 19990708 - BERNER GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 29920551 U1 20000330; EP 1103482 A2 20010530; EP 1103482 A3 20021113

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI