Global Patent Index - EP 1103493 A1

EP 1103493 A1 2001-05-30 - Refuse collecting vehicle with a device for gripping two refuse receptacles

Title (en)

Refuse collecting vehicle with a device for gripping two refuse receptacles

Title (de)

Müllsammelfahrzeug mit einer Vorrichtung zum Greifen von zwei Müllbehältern

Title (fr)

Véhicule de ramassage d'ordures avec dispositif de préhension pour deux récipients à ordures

Publication

EP 1103493 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00125773 A

Priority

DE 29920644 U

Abstract (en)

The dustcart has a front/side loader and a clamp receiver for dustbins. The clamp is a double one (10), which can receive two dustbins (27, 28) at the same time. The double clamp may have a fixed central web (12) and may have moving clamp arms (17, 18) with means of increasing the friction between themselves and the dustbins.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Müllsammelfahrzeug (1) mit einem Front/Seitenlader und einer Klammeraufnahme für Müllbehälter. Zur gleichzeitigen Entleerung mehrerer Müllbehälter ohne zusätzliches Bedienpersonal ist eine Doppelklammer (10) zur gleichzeitigen Aufnahmen von zwei Müllbehältern (27,28) vorgesehen, wobei diese in einer ersten Ausgestaltung einen feststehenden Mittelsteg (12) und in einer alternativen Ausgestaltung zwei voneinander getrennte unabhängig arbeitende Klammern (58,59) aufweist, wobei in beiden Fällen jeweils bewegliche Klammerarme (17,18;60,61;60',61')vorgesehen sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/04 (2006.01); B65F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/04 (2013.01); B65F 2003/023 (2013.01); B65F 2003/0233 (2013.01); B65F 2003/0279 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 29920644 U1 20000217; EP 1103493 A1 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040302

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010613

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI