Global Patent Index - EP 1103500 A2

EP 1103500 A2 2001-05-30 - Device for friction feeding of paper, carton blanks or similar

Title (en)

Device for friction feeding of paper, carton blanks or similar

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Friktionsanlegen von Papier-, Kartonzuschnitten oder dgl.

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation par friction de découpes en papier, carton ou similaire

Publication

EP 1103500 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121077 A

Priority

DE 29920730 U

Abstract (en)

The device consists of several rollers and conveyors (2,3a,3b,4) which gradually increase in rotational speed and are all connected to a common drive (1). The drive has a double sides toothed belt (5) which rotates the conveyor belts and/or wheels. A tensioner is provided to ensure that the belt is held at the correct tension.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung zum Friktionsanlegen von Papier-, Kartonzuschnitten oder dgl. ist grundsätzlich mit folgenden wesentlichen Bauteilen ausgerüstet: a) Friktionsfördergurten oder -Rädern (2), b) mit diesen eine Produktionsschleuse bildenden feststehenden oder gegenläufigen Rädern (4), c) mit nachgeschalteten Förderrollen oder -Gurten (3a,3b), mit höherer Fördergeschwindigkeit, d) einem gemeinsamen Antrieb (1) mit den Friktionsfördergurten oder -Rädern (2). Damit zuverlässig Produkt in einem großen dicken Bereich, d.h. insbesondere auch dickere Zuschnitte, zuverlässig separiert und gefördert werden können, treibt der gemeinsame Antrieb 1 einen doppelseitigen Zahnriemen (5) an, der die Antriebszahnscheiben der Friktionsfördergurte oder -Räder (2) und der Förderrollen oder -Gurte (3a,3b) umschlingt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/06; B65H 3/04; B65H 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/56 (2006.01); B65H 3/02 (2006.01); B65H 3/04 (2006.01); B65H 3/06 (2006.01); B65H 3/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/5284 (2013.01); B65H 3/02 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42322 (2013.01); B65H 2403/21 (2013.01); B65H 2403/211 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29920730 U1 20000406; EP 1103500 A2 20010530; EP 1103500 A3 20030226; JP 2001180839 A 20010703

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-12-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-11-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI