Global Patent Index - EP 1103508 A2

EP 1103508 A2 2001-05-30 - Device for folding flat signatures

Title (en)

Device for folding flat signatures

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Falzen flächiger Exemplare

Title (fr)

Dispositif de pliage d'exemplaires plats

Publication

EP 1103508 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124395 A

Priority

  • DE 19956248 A
  • FR 0008298 A

Abstract (en)

The method for folding printed copy with several layers (4) comprises leaving sections (41) of the inner layers with a rounded fold (8) rather than a sharp fold (6) . These are at the positions of the staples and are produced by gaps in the folding rollers. An Independent claim is included for a machine for carrying out the above process.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren zum Falzen flächiger Exemplare (1), wobei die Exemplare (1) aus mehreren Exemplarlagen (4, 6) bestehen, durch Falzvorgänge werden an den mehrlagigen Exemplaren (1) offene Enden (3, 7) und geschlossene Falzrückenbereiche (2, 6) ausgebildet. Die Falzrücken (6) innenliegender Exemplare (4, 5) des Exemplares umfassen ungefalzte Abschnitte (41) sowie längsgefalzte Abschnitte (42) in alternierender Abfolge. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 45/12; B65H 45/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/16 (2006.01); B65H 45/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/12 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1118 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1316 (2013.01); B65H 2404/14 (2013.01); B65H 2701/18292 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103508 A2 20010530; EP 1103508 A3 20040128; JP 2001187670 A 20010710; US 6602176 B1 20030805

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040729

2004-11-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 45/12 A

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 45/16 B

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI