Global Patent Index - EP 1103511 A2

EP 1103511 A2 2001-05-30 - Method and device for monitoring a drive of a lifting winch

Title (en)

Method and device for monitoring a drive of a lifting winch

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überwachung des Betriebs von Hubwinden

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour contrôler l'entraînement d'un treuil d' un appareil de levage

Publication

EP 1103511 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124423 A

Priority

DE 19956265 A

Abstract (en)

The winch operation monitoring method determines the cable force, the load variations, the dynamic response and/or the residual working life of the winch (1), with detection of the torque of the winch drive (2) and the position of a lever arm of the winch cable (4), for calculating the cable force. The collective loading is determined from the time characteristic of the cable loading, for calculation of the residual working life. An Independent claim for a monitoring device for the operation of a lifting winch is also included.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Überwachung des Betriebs von Hubwinden von Kränen, wobei auf die Hubwinde (1) wirkende Seilkräfte dynamisch bestimmt, Lastwechsel und eine dynamische Beanspruchung ermittelt und/oder eine Restlebensdauer bestimmt werden. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, daß ein Drehmoment eines Hubwindenantriebs (2) bestimmt wird, ein Hebelarm des Seils (4) bezüglich der Hubwinde bestimmt und zeitlich dem jeweilig bestimmten Drehmoment zugeordnet wird, und aus dem jeweiligen Drehmoment und dem zugeordneten Hebelarm die Seilkraft bestimmt wird. Aus dem zeitlichen Verlauf der Seilkraft wird das für die Lebensdauer bestimmende Lastkollektiv errechnet, aus dem die Restlebensdauer bestimmt werden kann. Darüber hinaus ist vorgesehen, die absolute Abspullänge des Seiles, dessen Geschwindigkeit und Beschleunigung sowie die Seilkraft unter Berücksichtigung der Wicklungslagen und die Windendrehzahl zu ermitteln und zu überwachen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66D 1/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66D 1/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103511 A2 20010530; EP 1103511 A3 20010718; EP 1103511 B1 20050406; DE 19956265 A1 20010607; DE 19956265 B4 20050630

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161205

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151108

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060110

2006-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009977 P 20050512

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-04-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050406

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040225

2002-04-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011206

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI