Global Patent Index - EP 1103516 A1

EP 1103516 A1 2001-05-30 - Vapour recovery device for a fuel filling installation

Title (en)

Vapour recovery device for a fuel filling installation

Title (de)

Gasrückführungsvorrichtung für Tankstellen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de récupération de vapeurs pour station à essence

Publication

EP 1103516 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00850199 A

Priority

SE 9904304 A

Abstract (en)

A vapour recirculating device for a fuel filling installation, said fuel being liquid and highly volatile, such as petrol, and said device comprising a vapour pumping means (11) for recirculating fuel vapour. Said vapour pumping means (11) has at least two vapour pumps (10) with separate inlets (9) and outlets (9) arranged in a pump housing component. The vapour pumps (10) are interconnected by means of a common drive shaft (14) and have an overflow valve (21) to allow common operation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/04 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/0486 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103516 A1 20010530; EP 1103516 B1 20080820; DE 60039955 D1 20081002; SE 523480 C2 20040420; SE 9904304 D0 19991126; SE 9904304 L 20010527

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151124

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151124

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151124

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60039955

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141113

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141107

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141105

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081120

2009-07-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090525

2008-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60039955 P 20081002

2008-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2008-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011120

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI