Global Patent Index - EP 1103594 A2

EP 1103594 A2 2001-05-30 - Detergent composition

Title (en)

Detergent composition

Title (de)

Wasch- und Reinigungsmittel

Title (fr)

Composition détergente

Publication

EP 1103594 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00125074 A

Priority

DE 19957038 A

Abstract (en)

Detergent contains an alkalization agent (partially) coated with a material or compounded such that after t1+1-25 min. at most 10% and after t1+3-30 min. at least 90% is released

Abstract (de)

Wasch- und Reinigungsmittel, die eine gezielte und definierte Freisetzungskinetik aufweisen und deren Kombination der Inhaltsstoffe während des Waschganges eine pH-Verschiebung vom schwach sauren oder neutralen bis in den üblichen alkalischen Bereich hinein erzeugt, enthalten Alkalisierungsmittel, das ganz oder teilweise mit einem Hüllmaterial beschichtet oder so compoundiert ist, daß dieses in der Waschflotte nach einem Zeitraum t1 von 1 min. bis 25 min. zu höchstens 10% und nach t1 plus 3 min. bis 30 min. zu mindestens 90% freigesetzt ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/06; C11D 3/08; C11D 3/10; C11D 3/12; C11D 3/20; C11D 3/39; C11D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/06 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/044 (2013.01); C11D 3/06 (2013.01); C11D 3/10 (2013.01); C11D 3/1246 (2013.01); C11D 3/3942 (2013.01); C11D 17/0039 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103594 A2 20010530; EP 1103594 A3 20031015; DE 19957038 A1 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080308

2008-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

2006-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041012

2004-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041012

2004-07-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 17/00 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 17/06 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/06 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/10 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/08 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/39 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/12 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/20 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/02 B

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001117

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI