Global Patent Index - EP 1103611 A1

EP 1103611 A1 2001-05-30 - Nucleotide sequences coding for the genes sucC and sucD

Title (en)

Nucleotide sequences coding for the genes sucC and sucD

Title (de)

Für die Gene sucC und sucD kodierende Nukleotidsequenzen

Title (fr)

Séquences nucléotidiques codantes pour les gènes sucC et sucD

Publication

EP 1103611 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00125527 A

Priority

DE 19956686 A

Abstract (en)

Isolated polynucleotide (I), encoding corynebacterium succinyl-CoA synthetase, is new. Isolated polynucleotide (I), containing a sequence representing the sucC and/or sucD gene, is at least 70% identical with a sequence that encodes a polypeptide (IIa) containing fully defined sequence of (402 amino acids (aa)) (S2) or (294 aa) (S3), encodes a polypeptide (IIb) containing a sequence at least 70% identical with (S2) or (S3), is complementary (IIc) to (IIa) or (IIb), or contains at least 15 consecutive nucleotides (nt) of (IIa-c). Independent claims are also included for the following: (a) coryneform bacteria (A) in which at least one of the sucC and/or sucD genes is attenuated; (b) production (M1) of L-aa (especially lysine or glutamic acid) by fermenting a bacterium in which at least one of sucC and/or sucD has been attenuated, particularly 'switched off'; (c) corynebacterium containing a vector that includes a part (at least 15 consecutive nt) of (I); and (d) method (M2) of identifying nucleic acid that encodes succinyl-CoA synthetase, or is highly homologous with the sucC/sucD genes, by using as hybridization probe a sequence containing (I).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft für die Gene sucC und sucD kodierende Polynukleotide, die Polynukleotidsequenzen enthalten, ausgewählt aus der Gruppe a) Polynukleotid, das mindestens zu 70 % identisch ist mit einem Polynukleotid, das für ein Polypeptid kodiert, das die Aminosäuresequenz von SEQ ID No. 2 enthält, b) Polynukleotid, das mindestens zu 70 % identisch ist mit einem Polynukleotid, das für ein Polypeptid kodiert, das die Aminosäuresequenz von SEQ ID No. 3 enthält, c) Polynukleotid, das für ein Polypeptid kodiert, das eine Aminosäuresequenz enthält, die zu mindestens 70% identisch ist mit der Aminosäuresequenz von SEQ ID No. 2, d) Polynukleotid, das für ein Polypeptid kodiert, das eine Aminosäuresequenz enthält, die zu mindestens 70% identisch ist mit der Aminosäuresequenz von SEQ ID No. 3, e) Polynukleotid, das komplementär ist zu den Polynukleotiden von a), b), c) oder d), und e) Polynukleotid, enthaltend mindestens 15 aufeinanderfolgende Nukleotide der Polynukleotidsequenz von a), b), c), d) oder e), ein Verfahren zur fermentativen Herstellung von L-Aminosäuren unter Verwendung von coryneformen Bakterien, in denen die Gene abgeschwächt vorliegen und die Verwendung der Polynukleotidsequenzen als Hybridisierungssonden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/52; C12N 9/00; C12P 13/04; C12P 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 9/00 (2006.01); C12N 9/99 (2006.01); C12N 15/52 (2006.01); C12P 13/04 (2006.01); C12P 13/08 (2006.01); C12P 13/14 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C12R 1/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/93 (2013.01); C12P 13/04 (2013.01); C12P 13/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 0100844 A2 20010104 - BASF AG [DE]
  • [DA] EP 0197335 A1 19861015 - KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]
  • [X] WALSHAW DAVID L ET AL: "Regulation of the TCA cycle and the general amino acid permease by overflow metabolism in Rhizobium leguminosarum.", MICROBIOLOGY (READING), vol. 143, no. 7, 1997, pages 2209 - 2221, XP002163026, ISSN: 1350-0872
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 1 November 1997 (1997-11-01), COLE S T ET AL: "SUCCINYL-COA SYNTHETASE ALPHA CHAIN (EC 6.2.1.5) (SCS-ALPHA).", XP002163027
  • [A] DATABASE EMBL 1 November 1997 (1997-11-01), COLE S T ET AL: "SUCCINYL-COA SYNTHETASE BETA CHAIN (EC 6.2.1.5) (SCS-BETA).", XP002163028
  • [A] DATABASE EMBL 24 February 1999 (1999-02-24), HARRIS D ET AL: "Mycobacterium leprae cosmid L373.", XP002163029

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103611 A1 20010530; AU 7183700 A 20010531; BR 0005608 A 20010717; CA 2324496 A1 20010525; CN 1298019 A 20010606; DE 19956686 A1 20010531; HU 0004715 A2 20021028; HU 0004715 D0 20010228; ID 28476 A 20010531; JP 2001190290 A 20010717; KR 20010051915 A 20010625; MX 223007 B 20040927; MX PA00011289 A 20020523; PL 344145 A1 20010604; SK 17352000 A3 20010911; US 6623946 B1 20030923; ZA 200006884 B 20010525

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070124

2007-02-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEGUSSA GMBH

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060913

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001122

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI