Global Patent Index - EP 1103636 A1

EP 1103636 A1 2001-05-30 - Electrolytic cell plate

Title (en)

Electrolytic cell plate

Title (de)

Elektrolyseplatte

Title (fr)

Plaque pour cellule d'électrolyse

Publication

EP 1103636 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124257 A

Priority

DE 19956787 A

Abstract (en)

Electrolysis plate consists of an external non-conducting frame (4) made of fiber-reinforced cresol resin; and an electrically conducting bipolar graphite plate (5) with slits on both sides and having plastic skirts (15, 16) for introducing electrolyte solutions in the region of the electrolyte feed (9, 10).

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Elektrolyseplatte, bestehend aus einem äußeren, nicht leitenden Rahmen (4), insbesondere bestehend aus einem faserverstärkten Kresolharz, einer darin gelagerten, elektrisch leitfähigen, bipolaren, bevorzugt beidseitig geschlitzten Graphitplatte (5) beschrieben, die im Bereich der Elektrolytzuführung (9; 10) Kunststoffschürzen (15; 16) zur Zwangsführung für die Elektrolytlösungen aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25B 11/04 (2006.01); C25B 1/26 (2006.01); C25B 9/00 (2006.01); C25B 9/08 (2006.01); C25B 9/18 (2006.01); C25B 9/20 (2006.01); C25B 13/04 (2006.01); C25B 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25B 9/206 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103636 A1 20010530; DE 19956787 A1 20010531; JP 2001181881 A 20010703; KR 20010061947 A 20010707; PL 344075 A1 20010604; US 6395155 B1 20020528

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080320

2007-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071109

2004-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI