Global Patent Index - EP 1103637 A1

EP 1103637 A1 2001-05-30 - Method of producing AuCuGa alloy coating using electrolysis, and alloys produced by such a method

Title (en)

Method of producing AuCuGa alloy coating using electrolysis, and alloys produced by such a method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer AuCuGa-Legierungsbeschichtung unter Verwendung von Elektrolyse und nach diesem Verfahren hergestellte Legierungen

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une couche en alliage AuCuGa en utilisant l'électrolyse et les alliages obtenus par ce procédé

Publication

EP 1103637 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99402969 A

Priority

EP 99402969 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a method of producing a gold-copper-gallium (AuCuGa) alloy coating by electrodeposition on a substrate (2), using an aqueous electrolytic bath. The method is characterized in that the aqueous electrolytic bath comprises potassium aurocyanide (KAu(CN)2), copper cyanide (CuCN), potassium cyanide (KCN) or sodium cyanide (NaCN), and a gallium salt (e.g. gallium sulfate Ga2(SO4)3). In particular, the molar concentration of gold cations (ÄAu<+>Ü), copper cations (ÄCu<+>Ü) and gallium cations (ÄGa<3+>Ü) in the electrolytic bath is respectively comprised within the following ranges: 0,19 g/l ≤ ÄAu<+>Ü ≤ 2,17 g/l (0,1.10<-2> mol/l ≤ ÄAu<+>Ü ≤ 1,1.10<-2> mol/l); 0,31 g/l ≤ Äcu<+>Ü ≤ 1,59 g/l (0,5.10<-2> mol/l ≤ ÄCu<+>Ü ≤ 2,5.10<-2> mol/l); and 0,69 g/l ≤ ÄGa<3+>Ü ≤ 2,79 g/l (1.10<-2> mol/l ≤ ÄGa<3+>Ü ≤ 4.10<-2> mol/l). Such a method allows to provide an AuCuGa alloy coating having brightness and ductility properties which are equivalent to those of the prior art AuCuCd alloy coatings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 3/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/62 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103637 A1 20010530; AU 1755101 A 20010604; TW 546418 B 20030811; WO 0138609 A1 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-26 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080215

2007-12-12 [R17C] DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20071108

2007-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071010

2007-07-06 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033683

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENTHONE INC.

2002-04-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2002-02-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI