Global Patent Index - EP 1103640 A1

EP 1103640 A1 2001-05-30 - Selective cleaning line

Title (en)

Selective cleaning line

Title (de)

Selektive Reinigungslinie

Title (fr)

Ligne de nettoyage sélective

Publication

EP 1103640 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00811064 A

Priority

  • CH 215299 A
  • DE 10006853 A

Abstract (en)

The transport system to carry fiber flocking materials, from a bale breaker to fiber processing stations, has a mechanism to divert the flocking flow stream. One or more test units (PF) monitor the soiling of the fiber flocking to give the level of impurities present. The measurements are evaluated, to determine the path to be taken by the flocking material according to the intensity of cleaning required. The flock transport system has one or more bypass channels in the material movement path, to divide the flow into two or more separate flows. The first flow path has no processing stages, and the other paths have stages to act on the flocking. At the end of the bypass stretch, all the material flows are combined into a single path. A monitor is at each material feed, with a following direction change unit (UM,U1-U3). The monitor registers the condition of the material, with evaluation, and controls the direction change unit accordingly to divert it into the appropriate path for the cleaning required, or into the path where no cleaning actions are executed. The different paths are structured to apply various cleaning actions and processing characteristics, from a common material feed inflow, where the quality of the flocking material is monitored. The measurements by the monitor are evaluated to determine which transport path is to be selected according to the nature and extent of impurities registered. The separate paths come together at their end, into a common transport path. An Independent claim is included for a fiber flocking processing assembly, where the flocking material from the bales is monitored, and directed into appropriate paths through various cleaning stages as required. Preferred Features: The monitors register the level of nepping and/or impurities in the flocking and/or the looseness, to trigger the action of at least one path direction change unit. A monitor can be coupled and integrated into other measurement units such as a separator (VS) for foreign fibers. The direction change units are linked to a control to set the movement paths of the fiber material according to its type and/or delivered vols. and/or the final composition required. The fiber processing stages, in the transport paths, give a coarse cleaning, fine cleaning, intensive cleaning, intensive flocking loosening or a combination of actions.

Abstract (de)

Eine Flockentransportvorrichtung mit einem Umschaltmittel (UM) für den Flockenstrom, mit einem Prüfgerät (PF), welches den Verschmutzungsgrad des Fasermaterials prüft, wobei das Prüfgerät eine Auswertung umfasst, welche das Reinigungsbedürfnis des geprüften Materials ermittelt und das Umschaltmittel entsprechend steuert. Sowie eine Flokkenverarbeitungsanlage mit mehreren Transportwegen (A,B), welche verschiedene Bearbeitungscharakteristiken aufweisen. Zusätzlich kann die Flockenverarbeitungsanlage über einem Steuermittel gesteuert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 31/00; D01G 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 13/00 (2006.01); D01G 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 13/00 (2013.01); D01G 31/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GR IT LI TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103640 A1 20010530; EP 1103640 B1 20040303; US 6421883 B1 20020723

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-12 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060123

2005-11-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-03-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TRUETZSCHLER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041103

2005-01-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: TRUETZSCHLER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-12-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TRUETZSCHLER GMBH & CO.KGTEXTILMASCHINENFABRIK

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-06-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005500 P 20040408

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GR IT LI TR

2004-03-03 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE GR IT LI TR

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011127

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GR IT LI TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI