Global Patent Index - EP 1103643 A2

EP 1103643 A2 2001-05-30 - Improvement to a cotton knitting machine

Title (en)

Improvement to a cotton knitting machine

Title (de)

Verbesserung an Cotton-Wirkmaschine

Title (fr)

Perfectionnement à un métier à tricoter du type cotton

Publication

EP 1103643 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00124377 A

Priority

IT BO990630 A

Abstract (en)

An improved Cotton knitting machine, in which the needle bar (1) is actuated by a lever system which comprises an arm (4) which is fixed to the needle bar and is articulately connected to a first lever (5) provided with recesses (7,8) for engagement to a pivot (9) which is fixed on a second lever (11) which is radial with respect to a horizontal supporting shaft (12) and is controlled by an actuation cam (15) by way of a roller (14) which is urged onto the profile of the cam (15) by elastic elements (17), wherein the pivot (9) can be arranged on the second lever (11) so as to produce an oscillation of the arm (4), by action of the first lever (5), according to a preset criterion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 11/02; D04B 15/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 11/02 (2006.01); D04B 15/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 11/02 (2013.01); D04B 15/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB PT TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103643 A2 20010530; EP 1103643 A3 20020320; EP 1103643 B1 20040609; DE 60011376 D1 20040715; DE 60011376 T2 20050623; IT 1311398 B1 20020312; IT BO990630 A1 20010523; IT BO990630 D0 19991123

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60011376

- Effective date: 20120601

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041109

2005-07-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041120

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050310

2004-11-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041120

2004-09-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60011376 P 20040715

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB PT TR

2004-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: RO

2004-06-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-09 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030407

2002-12-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB PT TR

2002-12-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20020801

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB PT TR

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI