Global Patent Index - EP 1103648 A2

EP 1103648 A2 2001-05-30 - Method and condenser dryer for drying clothes

Title (en)

Method and condenser dryer for drying clothes

Title (de)

Verfahren und Kondensationstrockner zum trocknen von Kleidungen

Title (fr)

Procédé et sèche-linge à condensation pour séchage de vêtements

Publication

EP 1103648 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00121734 A

Priority

IT PN990085 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a method and an apparatus for drying clothes, in which the temperature of the drying air is pre-set in accordance with the type of clothes to be handled. The method is characterized in that, during a drying cycle, also the rotating speed of the drum is variable within ranges that are pre-set in accordance with the type of clothes being handled in a manner that is proportional to the amount of water that is removed from the clothes, ie. inversely proportional to the desired drying degree. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 58/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/28 (2013.01); D06F 2058/2809 (2013.01); D06F 2058/2829 (2013.01); D06F 2058/2864 (2013.01); D06F 2058/2877 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103648 A2 20010530; EP 1103648 A3 20020814; EP 1103648 B1 20051221; DE 60024955 D1 20060126; DE 60024955 T2 20060713; ES 2250060 T3 20060416; IT 1311719 B1 20020319; IT PN990085 A1 20010529; IT PN990085 D0 19991129

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141006

2015-11-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151127

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131017

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091006

2010-06-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060922

2006-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2250060 T3

2006-03-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60024955 P 20060126

2005-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-12-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-12-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-09-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS ITALY S.P.A.

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040816

2003-05-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030201

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI