Global Patent Index - EP 1103649 A3

EP 1103649 A3 2002-09-18 - Automatic apparatus for cutting fabrics

Title (en)

Automatic apparatus for cutting fabrics

Title (de)

Automatische Gewebeschneidvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Machine automatique de coupe de tissus

Publication

EP 1103649 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00830073 A

Priority

IT RN990032 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1103649A2] The invention relates to an automatic apparatus for cutting fabrics. It comprises a device (1) for shaping an edge (2a) of a length of fabric (2) and at least one drive roller (3) designed to allow displacement of the fabric (2) from one side to the other of the shaping device (3). The apparatus (10) is also provided with cutting means (4) which are designed to remove the edge (2a) of the fabric (2) and can be positioned so as to be able to operate both in series with the shaping device (1) and in synchronism therewith. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06H 7/02; B26D 3/10; B26D 7/06; B26D 9/00; B65H 20/02; D06H 7/16; D06H 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 3/10 (2006.01); D06H 7/02 (2006.01); D06H 7/16 (2006.01); D06H 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06H 7/223 (2013.01); B26D 3/10 (2013.01); D06H 7/02 (2013.01); D06H 7/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103649 A2 20010530; EP 1103649 A3 20020918; IT RN990032 A1 20000223

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-07-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI