Global Patent Index - EP 1103654 A2

EP 1103654 A2 2001-05-30 - Roll

Title (en)

Roll

Title (de)

Walze

Title (fr)

Rouleau

Publication

EP 1103654 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00309226 A

Priority

GB 9924646 A

Abstract (en)

An improved roll cover 4 used to cover a roll 2 for use in the press-section or forming section of paper, pulp and board making machines. The roll cover 4 has a plurality of bores 6, 12, the bores having substantially equal cross-sectional areas. In one embodiment the bores comprise through-bores 12 and blind-drilled holes 6, whereby each through-bore 12 is not immediately adjacent another through-bore 12 and is surrounded by an even distribution of blind-drilled holes 6. A circumferential groove 8 may be provided in the surface of the roll cover 4 which interconnects the bores. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/08; D21F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/08 (2006.01); D21F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/083 (2013.01); D21F 3/105 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103654 A2 20010530; EP 1103654 A3 20020619; EP 1103654 B1 20060621; AT 331071 T 20060715; DE 60028908 D1 20060803; DE 60028908 T2 20070215; GB 9924646 D0 19991222

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121019

2013-08-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60028908

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121019

2013-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 331071 T

- Effective date: 20121019

2012-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20111013

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101020

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101014

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070322

2006-10-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2006-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60028908 P 20060803

2006-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2006-03-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ROLL

2005-08-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ROLL COVER

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2002-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020719

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI