Global Patent Index - EP 1103657 A2

EP 1103657 A2 2001-05-30 - Method for the construction of a ballastless railway track and apparatus for performing the method

Title (en)

Method for the construction of a ballastless railway track and apparatus for performing the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen einer festen Fahrbahn und Vorrichtung zur Verwendung hierbei

Title (fr)

Méthode de construction d'une voie ferrée sans ballast et dispositif de mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 1103657 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00125680 A

Priority

DE 19956474 A

Abstract (en)

The method uses lifting and aligning machines, to install a track grid above the lower track bed (4) before the upper bed is cast. The lifting and aligning machines are dismantled into separate components (7,8,17) for transport to the construction site, assembled on site, and dismantled for removal. The machines are used to fix the track grid (2) during casting, and are dismantled only the upper bed has set. They are also used to hold shuttering for the upper track bed.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen einer festen Schienenfahrbahn mit quer zur Fahrbahn angeordneten, die Schienen tragenden Schwellen (31), die in eine obere Tragschicht eingegossen sind, die ihrerseits auf einer unteren Tragschicht (4) abgestützt ist, bei welchem ein vorgefertigter Gleisabschnitt (2) mit Schienen (19) und Schwellen (31), sogenannter Gleisrost, mittels Hebe- und Richtvorrichtungen oberhalb der unteren Tragschicht (4) positioniert und eingerichtet wird, bevor die obere Tragschicht vergossen wird, wobei die Hebe- und Richtvorrichtungen zur Ermöglichung des Einsatzes auch bei beengten Platzverhältnissen in Teile zerlegt zum Einsatz transportiert und vor Ort montiert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 1/00 (2006.01); E01B 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 1/004 (2013.01); E01B 29/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103657 A2 20010530; EP 1103657 A3 20020619; DE 19956474 A1 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021219

2003-04-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI