Global Patent Index - EP 1103665 A2

EP 1103665 A2 2001-05-30 - Device for the fixing of a built-in element of stainless steel, in particular a kitchen sink

Title (en)

Device for the fixing of a built-in element of stainless steel, in particular a kitchen sink

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Einbauelementes aus Edelstahl, insbesondere einer Küchenspüle

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'un élément intégré en acier inoxydable, en particulier un évier de cuisine

Publication

EP 1103665 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116093 A

Priority

DE 19956940 A

Abstract (en)

The sink (11) engages with its edge (12) on the top (13) of a work top (9), and has glued holders (1) at the bottom to engage with holder clips (16) on the cut-out edge. The holders have a mainly T-shaped cross section, with a head plate having the adhesive contact faces, and a mainly central locking bar (4). The locking bar is stabilized via supports engaging on the side of the head plate. The holders are of plastic or aluminum.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Einbauelementes aus Edelstahl, insbesondere einer Küchenspüle, in einem Ausschnitt einer Arbeitsplatte, wobei das Einbauelement mit seinem Umfang auf der Oberseite der Grundplatte aufliegt und mit an der Unterseite des Einbauelementes benachbart zum Umfang über Kontaktflächen angeklebte Halteelemente, die in den Ausschnitt hineinragen und mit am Ausschnittrand zu befestigenden Halteklammern zusammenwirken. Derartig angeklebte Halteelemente können sich bei ungewollter Hitzeeinwirkung ungewollt ablösen. Um dies möglichst zu verhindern, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Halteelemente einen im wesentlichen T-förmigen Querschnitt aufweisen mit einer die Kontaktfläche aufweisenden Kopfplatte und einem im wesentlichen mittig an dieser angreifenden Raststeg. Weiterhin wird angeregt, mehrere Halteelemente benachbart und beabstandet zueinander anzuordnen, die dann jeweils mit nur einer Halteklammer zusammenwirken um so einen Einfluß von seitlichen Momenten zu verhindern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/33

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/33 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/335 (2013.01); E03C 1/33 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103665 A2 20010530; EP 1103665 A3 20020522; DE 19956940 A1 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-02-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020923

2002-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-05-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI