Global Patent Index - EP 1103667 A2

EP 1103667 A2 2001-05-30 - Auxiliary device for holding edge insulations

Title (en)

Auxiliary device for holding edge insulations

Title (de)

Hilfsvorrichtung zur Halterung von Randisolierungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif auxiliaire de maintien d'isolations de bordure

Publication

EP 1103667 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00123193 A

Priority

DE 29920521 U

Abstract (en)

A method for fitting slabs of thermal insulation (150 around the edges of a poured concrete floor has metal brackets made of flat strip and adjusted to fit over the top of the support wall. The bracket is adjusted to the width of the wall by overlapping central sections (6). The outer end of the bracket has an upper extension which supports the outside of the insulation (15). Pins (21) grip the bottom edge of the insulation and the bracket is secured to the wall by masonry pins. The slabs of insulation form the outer shuttering for the poured floor and the brackets remain in place to be covered by the subsequent rendering of the walls.

Abstract (de)

Eine Hilfsvorrichtung zur Halterung der Randisolierung (15) bei der Fertigung von Betondecken, -gurten, -kragplatten und dergleichen in Form eines Bügels (11) mit einem Basisteil (12), das auf den oberen Rand einer Wand (10), eines Rollladenkastens oder dergleichen aufsetzbar ist, wobei am Basisteil (12) mindestens ein nach oben ragendes Anschlagelement (13) für eine Randisolierung (15) des zu fertigenden Betonteils vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 5/32; E04G 11/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 11/36 (2006.01); E04B 5/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 11/365 (2013.01); E04B 2005/322 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29920521 U1 20000113; EP 1103667 A2 20010530; EP 1103667 A3 20010613

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011214

2002-04-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI