Global Patent Index - EP 1103668 A1

EP 1103668 A1 2001-05-30 - PLANAR-CONVEX TILE

Title (en)

PLANAR-CONVEX TILE

Title (de)

PLAN-KONVEXE FLIESE

Title (fr)

TUILE PLAN-CONVEXE

Publication

EP 1103668 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00931292 A

Priority

  • ES 0000192 W
  • ES 9901429 U

Abstract (en)

It comprises two convex segments (1) open on the bottom and a further two deeply grooved segments (2) open on the top, all of these internally staggered; as well as with respective grooves (2) centrally placed with respect to nearby staggerings, (12) of the flat end (8) of the tile and (13) of the convex end, while a ridge (3) on its lower surface (4) is interposed between a doubly raised lateral overlap (6) and a further ridge (7) also longitudinal to flat end (8) of the next tile.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 1/04; E04D 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0075454A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103668 A1 20010530; EP 1103668 B1 20040630; AU 4927400 A 20001228; BR 0006186 A 20010417; ES 1043085 U 19991101; ES 1043085 Y 20010201; ES 2223521 T3 20050301; PT 1103668 E 20041130; WO 0075454 A1 20001214

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-06 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20131218

2013-12-18 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2013-11-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080611

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2009-12-11 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20091202

2008-09-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080612

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2005-12-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-06-30 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Free text: REDLAND IBERICA, S.A. ES

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-06-30 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Free text: URALITA TEJADOS, S.A. ES

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-06-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-06-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-05-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2223521 T3

2004-12-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT PT

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI