Global Patent Index - EP 1103669 A2

EP 1103669 A2 2001-05-30 - Roof tiling set

Title (en)

Roof tiling set

Title (de)

Bausatz zum Eindecken von Dächern mit Ziegeln

Title (fr)

Kit pour recouvrir une toiture de tuiles

Publication

EP 1103669 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00500057 A

Priority

ES 9902597 A

Abstract (en)

A roof tiling set comprising: ÄaÜ a body member (2): having a lower surface (4); two side surfaces (10); an upper surface (25) on which there are situated two or more cavities (27), and an intermediate region (28a) situated between each two cavities (27) and directed substantially parallel to the bottom of the cavities (27); ÄbÜ first tiles (18b) non-releasably lodged in respective cavities (27); ÄcÜ at least one second tile (18c) adapted to rest on the intermediate region (28a); and ÄdÜ optionally, sections (34) adapted for attachment to the spars (40) and for joining two adjacent body members. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 3/35; E04D 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/22 (2006.01); E04D 1/26 (2006.01); E04D 1/28 (2006.01); E04D 3/35 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/265 (2013.01); E04B 7/225 (2013.01); E04D 1/28 (2013.01); E04D 3/351 (2013.01); E04D 3/352 (2013.01); E04D 3/358 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103669 A2 20010530; EP 1103669 A3 20010808

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031031

2002-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011218

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04D 3/35 A, 7E 04D 1/28 B, 7E 04D 1/26 B, 7E 04B 7/20 B

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI