Global Patent Index - EP 1103671 A2

EP 1103671 A2 2001-05-30 - Overhanging stair

Title (en)

Overhanging stair

Title (de)

Freitragende Treppe

Title (fr)

Escalier en porte-à-faux

Publication

EP 1103671 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124964 A

Priority

DE 29920844 U

Abstract (en)

The stairs are characterized by the following features: a) successive treads (12) are joined to one another at both ends by means of carrier bolts (28); b) each tread is anchored to the wall by a wall anchor (32); c) the handrail (20) is a supporting handrail which together with the posts at each end forms a support frame; c) loads of the treads are at least partially transferred to this frame by means of the handrail bars (30).

Abstract (de)

Eine freitragende Treppe (10.1) mit Trittstufen (12), die Trittstufen (12) verbindenden Tragbolzen (28), einem an der wandfreien Seite angeordneten Geländer (18) mit Handlauf (20) und zwischen dem Handlauf (20) und den Trittstufen (12) angeordneten Geländerstäben (20), wandseitig angeordneten Wandankern (34) zum Anschluss der Trittstufen (12) an eine Baukonstruktion, insbesondere Wand (76), ist gekennzeichnet durch die Kombination folgender Merkmale: aufeinanderfolgende Trittstufen (12) sind sowohl in ihrem wandseitigen Endbereich als auch in ihrem wandfreien Endbereich jeweils über einen Tragbolzen (28) miteinander verbunden, jede Trittstufe (12) ist über einen Wandanker (34) an die Wand angeschlossen und der Handlauf (20) ist als tragender Handlauf (20) ausgebildet, der zusammen mit einem Antrittpfosten (22) und einem Austrittpfosten (24) ein Rahmentragwerk bildet und in den über die Geländerstäbe (30) die Belastung der Trittstufen (12) zumindest teilweise eingeleitet wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 11/022; E04F 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/022 (2006.01); E04B 1/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/022 (2013.01); E04B 2001/8254 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 29920844 U1 20000525; EP 1103671 A2 20010530; EP 1103671 A3 20030122

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-11-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI