Global Patent Index - EP 1103673 A1

EP 1103673 A1 2001-05-30 - Distance holder for movable scaffold

Title (en)

Distance holder for movable scaffold

Title (de)

Abstandshalter für fahrbares Gerüst

Title (fr)

écarteur pour échafaudage mobile

Publication

EP 1103673 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124424 A

Priority

DE 19956980 A

Abstract (en)

The spacer (2) for a mobile scaffolding tower (4) has a holder (6,8) which is releasably connected to the frame. A base (10,12) is attached to the holder with a longitudinal cut out. A wall contact foot (14,16) is mounted on the base. The holder can be a tube clamp.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Abstandshalter (2) zur Befestigung an einem fahrbaren Gerüst (4) oder dgl., welcher ein Halterungsteil (6, 8), einen mit dem Halterungsteil (6, 8) verbundenen Grundkörper (10, 12), der eine längliche Ausdehnung hat, und ein mit dem Grundkörper (10, 12) verbindbares Wandkontaktelement (14, 16) aufweist, das mindestens ein Rollelement (16) aufweist. Das Halterungsteil weist eine Rohrschelle (6 ,8) auf, die mit dem Gerüst (4) lösbar verbindbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 1/26; E04G 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 1/24 (2006.01); E04G 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 1/24 (2013.01); E04G 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103673 A1 20010530; CA 2326818 A1 20010526; DE 19956980 C1 20010517

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040330

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011008

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI