Global Patent Index - EP 1103675 A2

EP 1103675 A2 2001-05-30 - Vehicle door locking system

Title (en)

Vehicle door locking system

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeug-Türschliesssystem

Title (fr)

Système de verrouillage pour porte de véhicule

Publication

EP 1103675 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124412 A

Priority

DE 19957419 A

Abstract (en)

The automobile door locking system has a door lock and door handle (10) adjacent the door lock, with at least one sensor element in the form of an ultrasonic transducer (12) for transmission and/or reception of sound waves, for detecting the proximity of a hand to the door handle and/or contact with the door handle, from the variations in the ultrasonic field (13). Also included are Independent claims for the following: (a) a door handle for an automobile door locking system; and (b) a control method for an automobile door locking system.

Abstract (de)

Es werden ein Kraftfahrzeug-Türschließsystem, eine Türaußengriffanordnung und ein Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Kraftfahrzeug-Türschließsystems vorgeschlagen. Zur Sensierung einer Annäherung an einen Türaußengriff oder einer Berührung eines Türaußengriffs wird zumindest im wesentlichen ausschließlich in dem von dem Türaußengriff definierten Eingreifraum ein Ultraschallfeld erzeugt, wobei Änderungen und/oder Unterbrechungen des Ultraschallfelds erfaßt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 1/00; E05B 17/22; E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/78 (2014.01); E05B 85/00 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/01 (2013.01); E05B 81/78 (2013.01); E05B 81/77 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103675 A2 20010530; EP 1103675 A3 20030122; DE 19957419 A1 20010613; US 2002093418 A1 20020718

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-11-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI