Global Patent Index - EP 1103678 A1

EP 1103678 A1 2001-05-30 - Handle operated lock

Title (en)

Handle operated lock

Title (de)

Drückerbetätigtes Schloss

Title (fr)

Serrure actionnée par une poignée

Publication

EP 1103678 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00119796 A

Priority

DE 29920504 U

Abstract (en)

A press button actuated lock (10), especially an insertion lock, comprises a plastic housing (12) with a base (14) which contains depressions (44,76,82,94) and/or raised areas. Functional parts of the lock are located at the depressions and raised areas.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein drückerbetätigtes Schloss (10), insbesondere Einsteckschloss, mit einem aus Kunststoff bestehenden Gehäuse (12) mit Schlossboden (14), wobei im Schlossboden (14) Vertiefungen (44, 76, 82, 94) und/oder am Schlossboden (14) Erhebungen vorgesehen sind, in bzw. an welchen Funktionsteile des Schlosses (10) geführt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/00; E05B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/16 (2006.01); E05B 59/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/1635 (2013.01); E05C 9/025 (2013.01); E05C 9/026 (2013.01); E05B 59/00 (2013.01); E05B 2015/1664 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29920504 U1 20000224; EP 1103678 A1 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040831

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010707

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI