Global Patent Index - EP 1103679 A2

EP 1103679 A2 2001-05-30 - Mortise lock for mounting in a door or the like

Title (en)

Mortise lock for mounting in a door or the like

Title (de)

Einsteckschloss zur Befestigung in einer Tür oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Serrure encastrée pour montage dans une porte ou similaire

Publication

EP 1103679 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00203763 A

Priority

NL 1013645 A

Abstract (en)

Mortise lock for mounting in a door or the like, comprising a case (1) in which a bolt (2) is slidably received. A recess (9) in the bolt (2) holds a conveying element (10), which is slidable transverse to its direction of movement (V) and is under the action of a compression spring (11). Through the conveying element (10), the bolt can be moved by an actuating arm (20) being connected with an inner cylinder (18), which is mounted in an outer cylinder (17) and can be rotated with the help of a key (19). The conveying element (10) has pins (13) being guided by slots (14) mounted in the case (1). On sliding the bolt (2) outwards, the actuating arm (20) will be released from the conveying element (10) and the latter will then press the bolt (2) further outwards by means of the compressing spring (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 63/08; E05B 15/10; E05B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/0021 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5317890 A 19940607 - WU DANNY K T [TW]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE GB NL

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103679 A2 20010530; EP 1103679 A3 20070110; EP 1103679 B1 20100106; NL 1013645 C2 20010528

INPADOC legal status


2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131011

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101027

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101027

2010-12-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101007

2010-03-31 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-01-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE GB NL

2010-01-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080421

2007-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2007-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE GB NL

2007-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070207

2007-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2007-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 63/00 20060101AFI20061201BHEP

2004-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: J.W. VAN DER WAL BEHEER B.V.

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI