Global Patent Index - EP 1103681 A1

EP 1103681 A1 2001-05-30 - Vehicle door with a locking device with electric locking and unlocking suitable to open with delay

Title (en)

Vehicle door with a locking device with electric locking and unlocking suitable to open with delay

Title (de)

Fahrzeugtür mit einem mit elektrischer Ent- und Verriegelung zur verspäteten Öffnung geeignetem Schloss

Title (fr)

Ouvrant de véhicule automobile avec serrure à condamnation/decondamnation électrique apte à s'ouvrir à retardement

Publication

EP 1103681 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403251 A

Priority

FR 9914966 A

Abstract (en)

The openable panel (1) has an electric lock (3) with a lock opening lever (8) with a manually operated member (5) that is mounted at a distance from the lock and can be operated manually by a user from the outside. A force transmission element (7) has two parts (7a,7b) connected to each other by an energy storage spring (11), and an immobilizing pin (12) immobilizes the second part (7b) when the lock is in the locked condition and releases the second part in response to an unlocking command. The force transmission element connects the manually operated member to the lock opening lever, which can move from a closed condition preventing the panel from being opened to an open condition in which the panel can be opened in response to the operation of the lever with the aid of the manually operated member.

Abstract (fr)

Dans cet ouvrant (1) comportant une serrure (3), qui inclut un levier d'ouverture (8), un organe de manoeuvre (5) monté sur l'ouvrant (1) à distance de la serrure et actionnable manuellement depuis l'extérieur de l'ouvrant, et un élément de transmission de force (7) qui relie l'organe de manoeuvre (5) au levier d'ouverture (8) de la serrure, laquelle serrure (3) peut passer d'un état fermé à un état ouvert en réponse à un actionnement du levier d'ouverture (8) à l'aide de l'organe de manoeuvre (5), l'élément de transmission de force (7) est en deux parties (7a,7b) reliées entre elles par un accumulateur d'énergie (11); un moyen de blocage (12) bloque la seconde partie (7b) de l'élément de transmission de force quand la serrure (3) est à l'état verrouillé, et libère la seconde partie de l'élément de transmission de force en réponse à une commande de déverrouillage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 1/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 49/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01); E05B 65/26 (2006.01); E05B 53/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/36 (2013.01); E05B 79/20 (2013.01); E05B 85/01 (2013.01); Y10S 292/23 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103681 A1 20010530; FR 2801623 A1 20010601; FR 2801623 B1 20020104; JP 2001159264 A 20010612; US 2001002091 A1 20010531; US 6543823 B2 20030408

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI