Global Patent Index - EP 1103694 A1

EP 1103694 A1 2001-05-30 - Roller shaft retraction mechanism for a roller shutter apron

Title (en)

Roller shaft retraction mechanism for a roller shutter apron

Title (de)

Einziehungsmechanismus für Rolladenaufwickelrohr

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de rétractabilité de tube d'enroulement pour tablier de volet roulant

Publication

EP 1103694 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403204 A

Priority

FR 9914788 A

Abstract (en)

The retraction drive for the reel of a sun awning has a spigot (1) with a pulley (3) at one end. The spigot fits into the end of a reel tube (2) for the awning. The spigot has an external groove (7) to receive a retractable wedge (8) which projects outwardly from the spigot. The spigot allows adjustment of the sliding engagement of the tube and spigot.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement pour tablier de volet roulant ou similaire comportant un embout (1) recevant éventuellement à l'une de ses extrémités une poulie (3), un flasque de guidage ou analogue et dont l'autre extrémité s'emmanche à l'intérieur d'un tube d'enroulement (2) du tablier, ledit dispositif étant caractérisé en ce que ledit embout (1) comporte sur une surface externe au moins une rainure (7) dans laquelle coopère au moins un organe de liaison escamotable (8) faisant saillie extérieurement par rapport à ladite surface externe dudit embout, ledit organe de liaison permettant de délimiter la position axiale du tube d'enroulement (2) du tablier par rapport audit embout (1) de manière à réserver une course de rétractabilité dudit tube d'enroulement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/171; E06B 9/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/171 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/171 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103694 A1 20010530; EP 1103694 B1 20030219; DE 1103694 T1 20011220; DE 60008199 D1 20040318; DE 60008199 T2 20040812; ES 2157187 T1 20010816; ES 2157187 T3 20030716; FR 2801338 A1 20010525; FR 2801338 B1 20020111

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60008199

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131117

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20141118

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150408

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131116

2013-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-06-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121127

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20111124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-03-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60008199 P 20040318

2004-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157187 T3

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES IT NL

2002-04-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES IT NL

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-20 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2001-09-03 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2001-08-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157187 T1

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010508

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES IT NL

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI