Global Patent Index - EP 1103695 A2

EP 1103695 A2 2001-05-30 - Device for mounting a drilling tool on a mast

Title (en)

Device for mounting a drilling tool on a mast

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Montierung eines Bohrwerkzeuges an einem Mast

Title (fr)

Dispositif de montage d'un outil de forage sur un mât

Publication

EP 1103695 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00403227 A

Priority

FR 9914892 A

Abstract (en)

Equipment attaches a soil drilling tool onto a mast. A carriage moves on runners extending along a face of the mast. A mounting head is at one end of an upper end of the tool and rotates it about its longitudinal axis. The head is mounted on the carriage and pivots about an axis orthogonal to the mast axis so that the tool axis is at an angle (a) to the mast axis. A movable assembly platform for the tool is at ground level.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif de montage d'un outil de forage (20) sur un mât (10). Il comprend des moyens formant glissière (12) solidaires d'une face dudit mât (10), un chariot (14) coopérant avec la glissière, une tête de montage (18) de l'extrémité supérieure dudit outil (20) et de mise en rotation dudit outil autour de son axe longitudinal, des moyens mécaniques de liaison (22) entre ledit chariot et ladite tête de montage, lesdits moyens définissant un axe de pivotement (XX',ZZ') de ladite tête par rapport au chariot autour d'un axe orthogonal à la direction de déplacement du chariot par rapport au mât ; et des moyens de déplacement (34) pour faire pivoter ladite tête de montage autour dudit axe de pivotement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 15/00; E21B 19/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 15/00 (2006.01); E21B 19/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 19/155 (2013.01); E21B 15/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1103695 A2 20010530; EP 1103695 A3 20030115; FR 2801633 A1 20010601; FR 2801633 B1 20020301

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-11-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI